Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023292

EP2023292 - PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WAKAYAMA, Yorihiko, c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC
IP Dev. Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743133.611.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP59698
Priority number, dateJP2006013216411.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006132164
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132746
Date:22.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023292
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/00, G06T1/20
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/24]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2009/07]
English:PROCESSING DEVICE[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2008Translation filed 
08.12.2008National basic fee paid 
08.12.2008Search fee paid 
08.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
12.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
05.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2018Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
11.12.2018Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[IA]  - MOYA V ET AL, "Shader Performance Analysis on a Modern GPU Architecture", MICROARCHITECTURE, 2005. MICRO-38. PROCEEDINGS. 38TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM I NTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BARCELONA, SPAIN 12-16 NOV. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051112), doi:10.1109/MICRO.2005.30, ISBN 978-0-7695-2440-5, pages 355 - 364, XP010854754 [I] 1,6,9-14 * abstract * * section 3 and page 5: last paragraph * [A] 2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.2005.30
 [A]  - Anonymous, "The GPU - How Xbox 360 Works | HowStuffWorks", (20050605), URL: http://electronics.howstuffworks.com/xbox-three-sixty3.htm, (20160609), XP055279207 [A] 1 * paragraphs contained in pages 3-5 *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "what is unified shaders? | Beyond3D Forum", (20060101), URL: https://forum.beyond3d.com/threads/what-is-unified-shaders.26043/, (20160602), XP055277527 [A] 1 * post #2 *
International search[X]JP2004110330  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN);
 [A]JPH11328436  (FUJITSU LTD)
by applicantJPH11328436