Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023427

EP2023427 - STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2019/09]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HOJO, Nobuhiko@c/o Panasonic Corporation, IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / OHTSUKA, Yu@c7o Panasonic Corporation, IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / YAMAMOTO, Taisuke@c/o Panasonic Corporation, IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2019/09]
Former [2009/07]01 / HOJO, Nobuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation, IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / OHTSUKA, Yu c7o Panasonic Corporation, IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / YAMAMOTO, Taisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation, IP Development Center
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2019/09]
Former [2009/07]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743206.011.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP59771
Priority number, dateJP2006013373312.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006133733
JP2006013373412.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006133734
JP2006025781222.09.2006         Original published format: JP 2006257812
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132786
Date:22.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023427
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023427
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/60, H01M10/44, H01M10/0564, H01M4/13
[2012/41]
Former International [2009/07]H01M4/60, H01M10/40, H01M10/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2019/09]
Former [2009/24]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:LAGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2009/07]
English:STORAGE DEVICE[2009/07]
French:COMPOSANT DE STOCKAGE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2008Translation filed 
14.11.2008National basic fee paid 
14.11.2008Search fee paid 
14.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
13.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
18.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2019Fee for grant paid
11.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]JPS6014762  (KAO CORP) [I] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2004111374  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [YD]JP2004342605  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [YD] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2002157995  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP1416553  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * * see [0033] -[0041], claims *;
 [Y]WO2005017953  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * * see [0009]; p.4, l.4/5; [0016] - [0019]; [0063]; Figs. 1A, 1B; claims *
International search[A]JP2004111374  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JP2004342605  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [AP]JP2006324179  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JP2002231244  (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY);
 [A]JPH0963651  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JP2004259618  (NEC CORP)
by applicantJP2004111374
 JP2004342605
 JPS6014762
    - YOHJI MISAKI ET AL., MOL. CRYST. LIQ. CRYST., (1996), vol. 284, pages 337 - 344
    - YOHJI MISAKI ET AL., CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1993), pages 1337 - 1340
    - T. SUZUKI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, pages 3108 - 3109
    - TAKESHI SENGA ET AL., MOL. CRYST. LIG. CRYST., (1997), vol. 296, pages 97 - 143
    - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 141, no. 12, page 3366