Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022764

EP2022764 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING PLATE GLASS BY ROLL FORMING, AND PLATE GLASS PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2013  [2013/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8921 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KOJIMA, Gen
c/o National Institute Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Tsukuba Central 2 1-1, Umezono 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP
02 / YOKOYAMA, Hiroshi
c/o National Institute Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Tsukuba Central 2 1-1, Umezono 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8568 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hall, Matthew Benjamin , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hall, Matthew Benjamin , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07743262.314.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP59827
Priority number, dateJP2006013620016.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006136200
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132797
Date:22.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022764
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C03B17/06, C03B13/04, C03B13/16
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/31]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLACHGLAS DURCH WALZFORMEN UND FLACHGLASPRODUKT[2009/07]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING PLATE GLASS BY ROLL FORMING, AND PLATE GLASS PRODUCT[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREILDE FABRICATION DE VERRE LAMINÉ PAR LAMINAGE, ET PRODUIT DE VERRE LAMINÉ[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008Translation filed 
12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Search fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
17.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/24]
15.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2002037635  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD);
 [A]JP2006028008  (SCHOTT AG);
 [A]JP2003313039  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD)
by applicantJPH09295819
 JP2001180949
 JP2002047019
 JP2003507681
 JP2003509227