Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023030

EP2023030 - PIPING JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.10.2010  [2010/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calsonic Kansei Corporation
2-1917, Nisshin-cho Kita-ku Saitama-shi
Saitama 331-8501 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ICHIMURA, Nobuo
c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 2-1917 Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku
Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP
02 / KUME, Takayuki
c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 2-1917 Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku
Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP
03 / OOBA, Fuminori
c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 2-1917 Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku
Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743380.315.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP59945
Priority number, dateJP2006014548525.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006145485
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138852
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023030
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16L39/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/25]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROHRVERBINDUNG[2009/07]
English:PIPING JOINT[2009/07]
French:JOINT DE CANALISATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2008Translation filed 
09.12.2008National basic fee paid 
09.12.2008Search fee paid 
09.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.09.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5454918U  ;
 [A]JPH066886U  ;
 [A]JPH08240288  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY)
by applicantJPH07269987