Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025709

EP2025709 - PRECURSOR COMPOSITION FOR POROUS MEMBRANE, PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF THE PRECURSOR COMPOSITION, POROUS MEMBRANE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE POROUS MEMBRANE, AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ULVAC, INC.
2500 Hagisono
Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJII, Nobutoshi
c/o ULVAC, Inc., Tsukuba Institute for Super Mater ials, 5-9-6 Tokodai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP
02 / NAKAYAMA, Takahiro
c/o ULVAC, Inc., Tsukuba Institute for Super Mater ials, 5-9-6 Tokodai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP
03 / KOHMURA, Kazuo
c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura
Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Hirofumi
c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura
Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN
Schwarztorstrasse 31
3001 Bern / CH
[2009/08]
Application number, filing date07743462.916.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007JP60027
Priority number, dateJP2006015484602.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006154846
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007142000
Date:13.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025709
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/36, C08G77/18, C09D5/25, C09D7/12, C09D183/04, H01L21/312, H01L21/316
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2009/37]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORLÄUFERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR PORÖSE MEMBRAN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER VORLÄUFERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PORÖSE MEMBRAN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER PORÖSEN MEMBRAN UND HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG[2009/08]
English:PRECURSOR COMPOSITION FOR POROUS MEMBRANE, PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF THE PRECURSOR COMPOSITION, POROUS MEMBRANE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE POROUS MEMBRANE, AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE[2009/08]
French:COMPOSITION PRÉCURSEUR POUR MEMBRANE POREUSE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LA COMPOSITION PRÉCURSEUR, MEMBRANE POREUSE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LA MEMBRANE POREUSE ET DISPOSITIF SEMICONDUCTEUR[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008Translation filed 
12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Search fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/38]
13.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004201007  (YAGIHASHI FUJIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * examples 5,12; claim - *;
 [X]US2003099844  (HANAHATA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0168] , [0169]; examples 8,20,21 *;
 [A]WO2004094311  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 US2007006776  [ ] (OIKE SHUNSUKE [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0056] - [0068] - [0071]; example 1; claim - *;
 [A]US2004235971  (HAMADA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * pages 5,8,9, paragraphs 41,44,45; examples 1-4; claim - *;
 [A]US2004087184  (MANDAL ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0062] , [0087] , [0088]; claim - *;
 [A]US6699797  (MORRIS MICHAEL A [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 19; table 1 *
International search[X]WO9903926  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al);
 [X]JP2002003784  (JSR CORP);
 [A]JP2003292890  (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL);
 [A]JP2005166716  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD, et al);
 [A]JP2005272188  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC);
 [A]JP2002164338  (ULVAC CORP);
 [AP]WO2006101027  (ULVAC INC [JP], et al);
 [AP]WO2006088036  (ULVAC INC [JP], et al)
by applicantWO9111390
 JP2000038509
 US6208014
 JP2002003784
 JP2004292304
    - NATURE, (1996), vol. 379, page 703
    - SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 5, page 247
    - J. PHYS. CHEM., B, (1997), vol. 101, page 6525
    - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 56, page 2218
    - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 50, page 1200