EP2025765 - ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Koji c/o NSK, Ltd., 5.50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Toru c/o NSK, Ltd., 5.50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 03 /
SENO, Naoya c/o NSK, Ltd., 5.50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 04 /
MITAMURA, Nobuaki c/o NSK, Ltd., 5.50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07743508.9 | 16.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007JP60073 | Priority number, date | JP20060140111 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006140111 | JP20060148497 | 29.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006148497 | JP20060150375 | 30.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006150375 | JP20070107250 | 16.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007107250 | JP20070112995 | 23.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007112995 | [2009/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007135929 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025765 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/40, C21D1/06, C22C38/00, C22C38/38 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C21D1/06 (EP,US);
C21D1/10 (EP,US);
C21D9/40 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
C23C8/26 (EP,US);
C23C8/32 (EP,US);
F16C33/32 (EP,US);
F16C33/34 (EP,US);
F16C33/62 (EP,US);
F16C33/64 (EP,US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,US);
C21D2211/008 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP,US);
F16C19/364 (EP,US);
F16C2202/04 (EP);
F16C29/0647 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2014/35] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER | [2009/08] | English: | ROLLING BEARING | [2009/08] | French: | PALIER À ROULEMENT | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2008 | Translation filed | 10.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 20.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09170624 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [Y] 8* abstract; tables 1, 2; claims *; | [XY]JP2005337361 (NSK LTD) [X] 1-7,9,10 * fig. 1; table 1: nos 1, 2, 4-13; [0017]-[0021] * [Y] 8 | International search | [Y]JPH09170624 (NIPPON SEIKO KK); | [A]JP2004052997 (NSK LTD); | [A]JP2005282854 (NSK LTD); | [X]JP2005337361 (NSK LTD) | by applicant | JPS6455423 | JPH0741934 | JP2003193200 | JP2006140111 | JP2006148497 | JP2006150375 | JP2007107250 | JP2007112995 |