Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022625

EP2022625 - LAMINATED BODY FOR RESIN GLASS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH LAMINATED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMO, Toshihisa
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
02 / MURAMATSU, Hisashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
03 / HIRAMATSU, Hiroyasu
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
04 / KONDO, Toshiro
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
05 / KATO, Makoto
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho
41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute
Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi 480-1192 / JP
06 / FUKUMORI, Kenzo
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho
41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute
Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi 480-1192 / JP
07 / KATAGIRI, Yosihide
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho
41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute
Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi 480-1192 / JP
08 / NAGAI, Takayuki
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
09 / WATANABE, Toshio
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2013/30]
Former [2009/07]01 / SHIMO, Toshihisa
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
02 / MURAMATSU, Hisashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
03 / HIRAMATSU, Hiroyasu
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
04 / KONDO, Toshiro
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
05 / KATO, Makoto
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi 480-1192 / JP
06 / FUKUMORI, Kenzo
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi 480-1192 / JP
07 / KATAGIRI, Yosihide
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho 41-1,Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi 480-1192 / JP
08 / NAGAI, Takayuki
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
09 / WATANABE, Toshio
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2013/30]
Former [2009/07]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743533.717.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP60098
Priority number, dateJP2006014734326.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006147343
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138865
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022625
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022625
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:B32B9/04, B32B15/08, C23C14/28
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/26]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LAMINIERTER KÖRPER FÜR HARZGLAS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCH EINES LAMINIERTEN KÖRPERS[2009/07]
English:LAMINATED BODY FOR RESIN GLASS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH LAMINATED BODY[2009/07]
French:CORPS STRATIFIÉ POUR VERRE DE RÉSINE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2008Translation filed 
09.12.2008National basic fee paid 
09.12.2008Search fee paid 
09.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
30.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2013Fee for grant paid
10.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.08.2010
Opposition(s)25.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2005126789  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] - [0010] - [0013] , [0020] , [0021] , [0046] *;
 [Y]JP2005126788  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0012] , [0018] , [0019] *;
 [Y]JP2005126785  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0013] , [0018] , [0020] *;
 [Y]EP1070762  (STEPHANOIS RECH MEC [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0035] , [0040] , [0041] , [0043] *;
 [Y]EP0726579  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 26 - line 31 * * page 7, line 47 - line 52 * * page 14, line 12 - line 18 * * page 24, line 3 - line 32 *;
 [Y]WO0202320  (MICROCOATING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 35; example 6 * * claims 41,47,48 *;
 [Y]WO0147704  (MICROCOATING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 14, line 7 - line 18 *;
 [Y]US2004018364  (OTA YURIE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0141] , [0142] *;
 [Y]US6090490  (MOKERJI SUBRATA [US]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1,10 *
International search[Y]JP2004035614
 [Y]JP2005126609
 [Y]JP2006082319
 [Y]JPH08309913
 [Y]JPH1052876
by applicant   - 'Polycarbonate Resin Handbook', 28 August 1992, NIKKAN KOGYO SHIMBUN LTD