Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023028

EP2023028 - PIPE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NITTO KOHKI CO., LTD.
9-4, Nakaikegami 2-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8555 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KOUDA, Toru
c/o NITTO KOHKI CO., LTD.
9-4, Nakaikegami 2-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8555 / JP
 [2015/29]
Former [2009/07]01 / KOUDA, Toru
c/o NITTO KOHKI CO., LTD., 9-4, Nakaikegami 2-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2015/29]
Former [2009/07]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743537.817.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP60102
Priority number, dateJP2006014091019.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006140910
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135939
Date:29.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023028
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023028
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16L37/32
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2015/29]
Former [2009/25]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROHRVERBINDUNG[2009/07]
English:PIPE JOINT[2009/07]
French:JOINT DE TUYAU[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2008Translation filed 
17.11.2008National basic fee paid 
17.11.2008Search fee paid 
17.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
22.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2015Fee for grant paid
01.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2015
Opposition(s)18.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005087239  (KOHDA TORU [JP]) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * [A] 2,3
International search[A]US2005087239
 [A]JPH11108279
 [A]JPH02154889
 [A]JPS62180193
by applicant JP2005127376