Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028516

EP2028516 - OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / TOGINO, Takayoshi
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
43-2 Hatagaya 2-Chome
Shibuya-Ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Shin
FUJII OPTICAL CO., LTD.
9-11 Minami-nagasaki 5-Chome
Toshima-Ku, Tokyo 171-0052 / JP
 [2013/30]
Former [2009/09]01 / TOGINO, Takayoshi
OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2 Hatagaya 2-Chome
Shibuya-Ku, Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Shin
FUJII OPTICAL CO., LTD. 9-11 Minami-nagasaki 5-Chome
Toshima-Ku, Tokyo 171-0052 / JP
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2009/09]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743740.815.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007JP60305
Priority number, dateJP2006016597515.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006165975
[2009/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007145050
Date:21.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028516
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028516
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G02B17/08, G02B13/06, G02B13/18, G03B15/00, G03B37/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/28]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES SYSTEM[2009/09]
English:OPTICAL SYSTEM[2009/09]
French:SYSTÈME OPTIQUE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2008Translation filed 
18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Search fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
16.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
07.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2013Fee for grant paid
11.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2013
Opposition(s)25.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
16.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006114575  (TOGINO TAKAYOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-5,10,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0146] - [0213]; figures 7,11 *;
 [I]US2003099045  (DOI TADASHI [JP]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US5473474  (POWELL IAN [CA]) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1865350  (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0091]; figure 4 *
International search[Y]US5473474  (POWELL IAN [CA]);
 [Y]JP2006284719  (OLYMPUS CORP)
by applicantUS4566763
 US5473474