Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023384

EP2023384 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT, SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renesas Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[2013/41]
Former [2010/40]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
For all designated states
Renesas Electronics Corporation
1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Former [2010/40]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SOGAWA, Yoshimichi
NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
02 / YAMAZAKI, Takao
NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Nobuaki
NEC Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/07]Stork Bamberger
Patentanwälte
Postfach 73 04 66
22124 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/46]Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Stasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/07]Wenzel & Kalkoff
Postfach 73 04 66
22124 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date07743857.022.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP60423
Priority number, dateJP2006014820729.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006148207
JP2007001009419.01.2007         Original published format: JP 2007010094
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138922
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023384
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/485, H01L23/498, H01L21/60, H05K3/34
[2013/01]
Former International [2009/07]H01L21/60, H01L21/3205, H01L23/52
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   NL,   SE [2009/27]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE, HALBLEITERKAPSELUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE ANORDNUNG[2009/07]
English:ELECTRONIC COMPONENT, SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2009/07]
French:COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE, ENSEMBLE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2008Translation filed 
27.11.2008National basic fee paid 
27.11.2008Search fee paid 
27.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
18.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4806725  (NARIZUKA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,14,16,17;
 [XI]US2004018660  (KIM SU HYEON [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,14,16,17;
 [XI]  - KIM S-H ET AL, "Investigation of Electroplated Ni and Ni-Cu alloy UBM (Under Bump Metallurgy) with Lead-Free Solders for Flip Chip Packages", 2002 INTERNAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROELECTRONICS. PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (2002), vol. 4931, ISBN 0-930815-66-1, pages 251 - 255, XP009112383 [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,14,16,17
 [XI]  - KIM S-H ET AL, "Residual Stress and Interfacial Reaction of the Electroplated Ni-Cu Alloy Under Bump Metallurgy in the Flip-Chip Solder Joint", JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC MATERIALS, WARRENDALE, PA, US, (20040901), vol. 33, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S11664-004-0021-1, ISSN 0361-5235, pages 948 - 957, XP007907282 [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,14,16,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11664-004-0021-1
 [XI]  - KULOJÄRVI K ET AL, "Effect of dissolution and intermetallic formation on the reliability of FC joints", MICROELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, WELA, PORT ELIN, GB, (19980501), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1108/13565369810215582, ISSN 1356-5362, pages 20 - 24, XP008080634 [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,14,16,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/13565369810215582
 [XI]  - KORHONEN T M ET AL, "Reactions of Lead-Free Solders with CuNi Metallizations", JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC MATERIALS, WARRENDALE, PA, US, (20001001), vol. 29, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S11664-000-0012-9, ISSN 0361-5235, pages 1194 - 1199, XP007907281 [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,14,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11664-000-0012-9
 [A]  - KULOJÄRVI K ET AL, "A new under bump metallurgy for solder bump flip chip applications", MICROELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, WELA, PORT ELIN, GB, (19980501), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1108/13565369810370328, ISSN 1356-5362, pages 16 - 19, XP009165101 [A] 6,14,16 * section "Materials and methods", second paragraph * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/13565369810370328
 [L]  - GHOSH G, "Copper-Nickel-Tin", GHOSH G, EFFENBERG G, ILYENKO S, LANDOLT-BÖRNSTEIN, NEW SERIES: NUMERICAL DATA AND FUNCTIONAL RELATIONSHIPS IN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, GROUP IV: PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, Vol. 11C3: NON-FERROUS METAL SYSTEMS, part 3, pages 303 - 337, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-47004-5_29, ISBN 978-3-540-25777-6, XP009164991 [L] 9,10,14,16,17 * figures 1,2,10 * * table 2 *
International search[X]JPH06188284  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JP2003303842  (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP)
by applicantJPH0684919
 JP2002203925