Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026585

EP2026585 - IMAGE CODING DEVICE, IMAGE CODING METHOD, AND IMAGE CODING INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AMANO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C.
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-Ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / TANAKA, Takeshi c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C.
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-Ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / MAEDA, Masaki c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C.
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-Ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / TSUDA, Kenjiro c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C.
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-Ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP
05 / IGUCHI, Masayasu c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C.
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-Ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP
06 / SHIBAHARA, Youji c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C.
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi
Chuo-Ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07743950.323.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007JP60516
Priority number, dateJP2006014384024.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006143840
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136088
Date:29.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026585
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/52
[2016/35]
Former International [2009/08]H04N7/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/25]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BILDCODIERVORRICHTUNG, BILDCODIERVERFAHREN UND BILDCODIER-IC[2009/08]
English:IMAGE CODING DEVICE, IMAGE CODING METHOD, AND IMAGE CODING INTEGRATED CIRCUIT[2009/08]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, ET CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008Translation filed 
12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Search fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1653745  (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-10 * abstract *
 [I]  - LI S ET AL, "Direct Mode Coding for Bipredictive Slices in the H.264 Standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050101), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2004.837021, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 119 - 126, XP011124673 [I] 1-10 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2004.837021
International search[A]JP2005295526  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JP2005244503  (SONY CORP);
 [A]JP2000244925  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD)
by applicantJP3879741B