Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027808

EP2027808 - CLEANING BODY AND CLEANING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TSUCHIYA, Akemi
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7, Aza Takasuka
Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / TANAKA, Yoshinori
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7, Aza Takasuka
Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2016/14]
Former [2009/09]01 / TSUCHIYA, Akemi
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION Technical Center 1531-7, Aza Takasuka Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / TANAKA, Yoshinori
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION Technical Center 1531-7, Aza Takasuka Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
Representative(s)Dolleymores
9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
[2016/14]
Former [2009/09]Eke, Philippa Dianne
Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date07744439.630.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007JP61028
Priority number, dateJP2006015274931.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006152749
[2009/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139166
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027808
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027808
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47L13/16, A47L13/20, A47L13/38
[2014/19]
Former International [2009/09]A47L13/16, A47L13/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/14]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSKÖRPER UND REINIGUNGSWERKZEUG[2009/09]
English:CLEANING BODY AND CLEANING TOOL[2009/09]
French:CORPS DE NETTOYAGE ET OUTL DE NETTOYAGE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008Translation filed 
28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
23.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2016Fee for grant paid
12.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2014
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
20.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.05.2007
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU30.05.2007
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/29]HU30.05.2007
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE30.05.2016
LU30.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU30.05.2007
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
IE30.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
IE30.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/37]BE31.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2006051434  (TSUCHIYA AKEMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0061]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4 [I] 3;
 [Y]EP1299026  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0037] *;
 [Y]US2004016074  (TANAKA YOSHINORI [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US823725  (HAYDEN HENRY A [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2006102471  (UNI CHARM CORP);
 [Y]JP2005169148  (UNI CHARM CORP);
 [A]JP3103720U