Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026167

EP2026167 - INPUT DEVICE AND INPUT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE, Shigeyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation
IPROC, IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi
2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / YAMAMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation
IPROC, IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi
2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / TAKASAKI, Shinichi c/o Panasonic Corporation
IPROC, IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi
2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Former [2009/08]Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date07744511.231.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007JP61123
Priority number, dateJP2006015527702.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006155277
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007142123
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026167
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023, H04M1/23, H04M1/247
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/30]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINGABEEINRICHTUNG UND EINGABEVERFAHREN[2009/08]
English:INPUT DEVICE AND INPUT METHOD[2009/08]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SAISIE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2008Translation filed 
04.11.2008National basic fee paid 
04.11.2008Search fee paid 
04.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
04.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.09.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2000148358  (NEC CORP);
 [Y]JP2003256117  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM JP, et al);
 [Y]JP2003196005  (POLYMATECH CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH08154120  (SONY CORP);
 [XP]WO2007055367  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al)
by applicantJPH08154120
 JP2001296953