Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026904

EP2026904 - HETEROPOLYACID SALT CATALYST, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HETEROPOLYACID SALT CATALYST AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALKYL AROMATIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2015
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / HIBI, Takuo
5-9-6, Goinishi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-0038 / JP
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date07744619.328.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007JP61232
Priority number, dateJP2006014772829.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006147728
JP2007011865327.04.2007         Original published format: JP 2007118653
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139216
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026904
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/28, B01J23/30, B01J35/10, C07C2/66, C07C5/27, C07C6/12
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:HETEROPOLYSÄURESALZ-KATALYSATOR, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HETEROPOLYSÄURESALZ-KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ALKYLAROMATISCHEN VERBINDUNG[2009/09]
English:HETEROPOLYACID SALT CATALYST, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HETEROPOLYACID SALT CATALYST AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALKYL AROMATIC COMPOUND[2009/09]
French:CATALYSEUR À BASE DE SEL D'UN HÉTÉROPOLYACIDE, PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE UN CATALYSEUR À BASE DE SEL D'UN HÉTÉROPOLYACIDE ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE UN COMPOSÉ AROMATIQUE ALKYLÉ[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2008National basic fee paid 
02.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
13.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/22]
19.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]JPH0525062  ;
 [A]US5254766  (FUJITA TERUNORI [JP], et al) [A] * column 4, line 17 - line 53 * * table 2 *;
 [A]US2003060362  (WANG YONG [US], et al) [A] * paragraphs [0009] , [0034] , [0049] , [0056] , [0063] - [0065] *;
 [A]EP1077082  (ROHM & HAAS [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0072]; figure 1 *;
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 10, Database accession no. 1993-080331, XP002448311 & JPH0525062 A 19930202 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD) [DA] * abstract *
 [PA]  - NARASIMHARAO ET AL, "Structure-activity relations in Cs-doped heteropolyacid catalysts for biodiesel production", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (20070515), vol. 248, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 226 - 234, XP022082983 [PA] * Section 2.1 "Experimental. Catalyst Preparation. " * * tables 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcat.2007.02.016