Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026069

EP2026069 - CONTAINER FOR DETERMINING PARTICLE AGGLUTINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / TAMAI, Toyohiro, c/o Olympus Intell. Prop. Services Co., Ltd.
2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
02 / NARITA, Hitoshi, c/o Olympus Intell. Prop. Services Co., Ltd.
2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
03 / KANEKO, Yasunobu, c/o Olympus Intell. Prop. Services Co., Ltd.
2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
04 / KOBAYASHI, Yumi, c/o Olympus Intell. Prop. Services Co., Ltd.
2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
 [2009/11]
Former [2009/08]01 / TAMAI, Toyohiro
/ JP
02 / NARITA, Hitoshi
/ JP
03 / KANEKO, Yasunobu
/ JP
04 / KOBAYASHI, Yumi
/ JP
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]von Hellfeld, Axel , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date07744648.204.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007JP61263
Priority number, dateJP2006015626605.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006156266
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007142174
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026069
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N33/80
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON PARTIKELAGGLUTINATION[2009/08]
English:CONTAINER FOR DETERMINING PARTICLE AGGLUTINATION[2009/08]
French:CONTENANT PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER L'AGGLUTINATION DE PARTICULES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2008Translation filed 
01.02.2008National basic fee paid 
01.02.2008Search fee paid 
01.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/26]
13.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/26]
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS54130195  (SUOVANIEMI FINNPIPETTE);
 [Y]JPS58754  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO);
 [Y]JP2001201505  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO);
 [Y]JP2004020535  (OLYMPUS CORP);
 [Y]JPH04285858  (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC);
 [Y]JPH07294528  (SCIBIEX SARL)
by applicantJPS6144268
 JPS6360854
 JPH087215B
 EP0725276
 DE10061515
 JP2004020535
 JPS6144268B
 EP0797097