Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021623

EP2021623 - ROTOR FOR WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2011  [2011/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lee, Min Sung
391, Sukseong-Ri
Oseong-Myeon, Pyeongtaek-Si Gyeonggi 451-873 / KR
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Kador, Utz Ulrich
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Kador, Ulrich
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2008/39]Kador, Ulrich
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date07745659.827.03.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007KR01486
Priority number, dateKR2006004736726.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060047367
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139278
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021623
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:F03D3/06
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROTOR FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE[2009/07]
English:ROTOR FOR WIND TURBINE[2009/07]
French:ROTOR POUR ÉOLIENNE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2007Translation filed 
18.10.2007National basic fee paid 
18.10.2007Search fee paid 
18.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2007Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/16]
21.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US4364709  (TORNQUIST AUGUST);
 [A]JPH10103216  (TSUTSUMI MICHIAKI);
 [A]JP2002070717  (EATON CORP);
 [A]JP2003120502  (OGAWA TEKKU KK, et al)