Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021480

EP2021480 - METHOD FOR PREPARING METAL NANOPARTICLE USING METAL BINDING PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.02.2014  [2014/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology
373-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu
305-701 Daejeon / KR
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sang Yup
212-702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-761 / KR
02 / PARK, Tae Jung
819-706, Gubongmaeul Gwanjeo-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-243 / KR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date07746028.517.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007KR01865
Priority number, dateKR2006004545522.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060045455
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136174
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021480
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/10, C07K14/825, C12P3/00, G01N33/531, G01N33/58
[2010/39]
Former International [2009/07]C12N15/70, C12N9/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/28]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES METALLNANOPARTIKELS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES METALLBINDENDEN PROTEINS[2009/07]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING METAL NANOPARTICLE USING METAL BINDING PROTEIN[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE NANOPARTICULES DE MÉTAUX À L'AIDE D'UNE PROTÉINE FIXANT LES MÉTAUX[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Search fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
23.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/07]
24.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - SAUGE-MERLE SANDRINE ET AL, "Enhanced toxic metal accumulation in engineered bacterial cells expressing Arabidopsis thaliana phytochelatin synthase.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200301), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 490 - 494, XP002597461 [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [I] 5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.1.490-494.2003
 [XI]  - WAWRZYNSKA ANNA ET AL, "Overexpression of genes involved in phytochelatin biosynthesis in Escherichia coli: effects on growth, cadmium accumulation and thiol level", ACTA BIOCHIMICA POLONICA, (2005), vol. 52, no. 1, ISSN 0001-527X, pages 109 - 116, XP002597462 [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [I] 5
 [XI]  - KIM ET AL, "Selective cadmium accumulation using recombinant Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1263/JBB.99.109, (20050201), vol. 99, no. 2, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 109 - 114, XP005673883 [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [I] 5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1263/jbb.99.109
 [X]  - SWEENEY R Y ET AL, "Bacterial Biosynthesis of Cadmium Sulfide Nanocrystals", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.CHEMBIOL.2004.08.022, (20041101), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 1553 - 1559, XP004651210 [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2004.08.022
 [X]  - DAMERON C T ET AL, "BIOSYNTHESIS OF CADMIUM SULFIDE QUANTUM SEMICONDUCTOR CRYSTALLITES", NATURE (LONDON), (1989), vol. 338, no. 6216, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 596 - 597, XP002597463 [X] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/338596a0
 [A]  - DEENDAYAL MANDAL ET AL, "The use of microorganisms for the formation of metal nanoparticles and their application", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00253-005-0179-3, (20060101), vol. 69, no. 5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 485 - 492, XP019332048 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-005-0179-3
 [T]  - Seung Hyun Kang, Engineered E. coli and its application in bioremediation and nanotechnology, XP002597464 [T] 1-9 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US6391590  (SANO TAKESHI [US], et al);
 [X]US6844485  (BUTLER KARLENE H [US], et al);
 [A]US6027711  (SHARMA SHUBH D [US]);
 [A]US6750056  (ACEY ROGER A [US], et al);
 [Y]  - PRESTA A. ET AL., "Incorporation of copper into the yeast Saccharomyces cerevisiae. Identification of Cu(I)-metallothionein in intact yeast cells", J. INORG. BIOCHEM., (199706), vol. 66, no. 4, pages 231 - 240, XP008091986

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0162-0134(96)00216-4
 [X]  - BERTINI I. ET AL., "High resolution solution structure for the protein part of Cu7 metallothionein", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 267, no. 4, pages 1008 - 1018, XP008090594

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01093.x
 [A]  - BYRD J. ET AL., "Characterization of the copper-thiolate cluster in yeast metallothionein and two truncated mutants", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19880515), vol. 263, no. 14, pages 6688 - 6694, XP008090904
 [A]  - THROWER A.R. ET AL., "Effect of mutation of cysteinyl residues in yeast Cu-metallothionein", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19880525), vol. 263, no. 15, pages 7037 - 7042, XP008090903