Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024551

EP2024551 - CLOTHES REFRESHING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.07.2016  [2016/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-ku
Seoul 105-875 / KR
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / HONG, Sog-Kie
13-603 Daelim Apt., 169-8, Sadang 3-dong, Dongjak- gu;
Seoul 156-775 / KR
02 / KIM, Dong-Won
911-1001, Hahan Jugong 9 Danji Apt. Haan 4-dong
Gwangmyeong-si, Gyeonggi-do 423-761 / KR
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07746039.218.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007KR01876
Priority number, dateKR2006004340515.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060043405
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132982
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024551
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/10, D06F58/28, D06F73/02
[2015/31]
Former International [2009/08]D06F58/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/34]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEIDERAUFFRISCHENDE VORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2009/08]
English:CLOTHES REFRESHING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME[2009/08]
French:APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE "RAFRAÎCHIR" DES VÊTEMENTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2008National basic fee paid 
28.10.2008Search fee paid 
28.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
16.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.03.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
26.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/29]
01.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0324589  (J S F HOLDINGS CORK LIMITED [IE]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 42; figure 1 * * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 47; figures 3, 8, 11 * * column 12, line 48 - line 62; figure 14 * * column 13, line 40 - line 60 *;
 [A]EP0816552  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 26 - line 50; figure 1 * * column 5, line 4 - line 43; figure 3 * * column 6, line 31 - line 52; figure 5 *;
 [A]US3899108  (FRAUENDORF MANFRED) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 53; figures 1, 4, 5 * * column 9, line 18 - column 10, line 15 *
International search[A]JPH04144598  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]WO2005001191  (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE], et al);
 [A]JPH11189968  (MIYATA YUKIO);
 [A]US5433919  (BALTES HANS [DE])