EP2024948 - HOME SECURITY APPLICATIONS FOR TELEVISION WITH DIGITAL VIDEO CAMERAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Ning 856 Quail Meadow Irvine, California 92603 / US | 02 /
LEE, Sang-Keun 166 Alicante Aisle Irvine, California 92614 / US | 03 /
KIM, Yeong-Taeg 85 Shadywood Irvine, California 92620 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07746343.8 | 04.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007KR02188 | Priority number, date | US20060448206 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 448206 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007142409 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024948 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/193, H04N7/18 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
G08B13/196 (KR);
G08B13/00 (KR);
G08B13/1961 (EP,US);
G08B13/19619 (EP,US);
G08B13/19636 (EP,US);
G08B13/19691 (EP,US);
G08B17/00 (KR);
H04N7/18 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, HU, NL [2009/27] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSANWENDUNGEN FÜR FERNSEHEN MIT DIGITALVIDEOKAMERAS | [2009/08] | English: | HOME SECURITY APPLICATIONS FOR TELEVISION WITH DIGITAL VIDEO CAMERAS | [2009/08] | French: | APPLICATION DE SÉCURITÉ DOMESTIQUE POUR UN TÉLÉVISEUR AVEC DES CAMÉRAS VIDÉO NUMÉRIQUES | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 08.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004350275 (MARCONI INTELLECTUAL PTY); | [Y]JP2002208073 (SECOM CO LTD); | [A]JP2005071064 (HITACHI HYBRID NETWORK CO LTD); | [A]JP2004128648 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC) |