Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019948

EP2019948 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 105-875 / KR
[2017/07]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-ku
Seoul 105-875 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jung-Hoon
1203 Bangbae Hansin Triple Apt.
816-3, Bangbae 4-dong, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-832 / KR
02 / MOON, Dong-Soo
103-902, Kunyoung Apt., 1701
Bongcheon-dong, Gwanak-gu
Seoul 151-768 / KR
03 / SEO, Ki-Won
303 Hanlla Jangmi Jootaek, 102-2
Bakdal-dong, Manan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 430-032 / KR
04 / HUH, Deok
1817-1006, Bandal Maeul Apt., Sang
1-dong, Wonmi-gu
Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 420-751 / KR
 [2017/07]
Former [2009/06]01 / KIM, Jung-Hoon
1203 Bangbae Hansin Triple Apt. 816-3, Bangbae 4-dong, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-832 / KR
02 / MOON, Dong-Soo
103-902, Kunyoung Apt., 1701 Bongcheon-dong, Gwanak-gu
Seoul 151-768 / KR
03 / SEO, Ki-Won
303 Hanlla Jangmi Jootaek, 102-2 Bakdal-dong, Manan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 430-032 / KR
04 / HUH, Deok
1817-1006, Bandal Maeul Apt., Sang 1-dong, Wonmi-gu
Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 420-751 / KR
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/07]
Former [2009/06]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstraße 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date07746589.618.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007KR02441
Priority number, dateKR2006004542620.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060045426
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136202
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2019948
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019948
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/00, F24F13/20
[2012/09]
Former International [2009/06]F24F1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/07]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGE[2009/06]
English:AIR CONDITIONER[2009/06]
French:CLIMATISEUR[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2008National basic fee paid 
03.12.2008Search fee paid 
03.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
24.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
29.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2016Fee for grant paid
22.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2012
Opposition(s)16.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
GB18.05.2017
IE18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
MT18.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
GB18.05.2017
IE18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
GB18.05.2017
IE18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
GB18.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/17]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU18.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/13]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/06]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH06147531  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0048] - [0058]; figures 6a,6b * [I] 9-13;
 [XI]JPH03194331  (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-13;
 [XI]JPH03129829U  (X) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-11;
 [XI]JPH03271639  (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-13;
 [XI]JPS49108647U  (X) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-13;
 [XI]JPS49135137U  (X) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-13;
 [XI]JPH08261496  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-13;
 [XI]JPH11201490  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1 * figures 2a,2b * [I] 2-13;
 [A]JPH04143527  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2001227768  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD);
 [A]JP2004301403  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD);
 [A]JP2005315537  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD);
 [A]JPS5596850  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0599445  (SHARP KK);
 [XP]KR100644544B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR])
by applicantJPH08261496