Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019724

EP2019724 - GOLF SWING TRAINING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.07.2015  [2015/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nam, Joong-Hoon
110-606 Taewang Dream Heights Sampung-dong
Gyungsan-si, Gyeongbuk 712-777 / KR
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza della Vittoria, 11
25122 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza dela Vittoria, 11
25122 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date07746635.723.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007KR02487
Priority number, dateKR2006004623423.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060046234
KR2006005198709.06.2006         Original published format: KR 20060051987
[2009/06]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136223
Date:29.11.2007
Language:KO
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2019724
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A63B69/36, G09B19/00, A63B57/00
[2014/18]
Former International [2009/06]A63B69/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:GOLFABSCHLAGÜBUNGSMASCHINE[2009/06]
English:GOLF SWING TRAINING MACHINE[2009/06]
French:MACHINE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À L'ÉLAN DE GOLF[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2007Translation filed 
28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
28.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/30]
07.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPS61213073  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [X] 7-9 * figure 2 * [I] 1-6;
 [XYI]WO2005023380  (MARQUARDT CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 7 * the whole document * [Y] 8 [I] 9;
 [Y]JPS5976271U  (N N) [Y] 8 * figure 4 *;
 [A]GB2278550  (KEEFFE JOHN JOSEPH O [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10233225  (ROSENBREIER REINHOLD [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *
International search[A]KR20030042192  (YOO KWANG YOUNG [KR]);
 [A]KR19990025656  ;
 [A]JPH09285584  (WADA KINZOKU KOGYO KK);
 [A]KR100486019B  (MYUNGSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])