Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024486

EP2024486 - METHOD OF PRODUCING YEAST FERMENTED BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heineken Supply Chain B.V.
Burgemeester Smeetsweg 1
2382 PH Zoeterwoude / NL
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / MULDER, Hendrikus
Prinses Irenelaan 20
1911 HW Uitgeest / NL
02 / SNIP, Onno Cornelis
Leeuweriklaan 16
2289 EG Rijswijk / NL
03 / BLOEMEN, Herman Hendrik Jan
Boshuizerlaan 22
2321 SH Leiden / NL
04 / BANKS, Douglas John
61 John Gill Road, Cockle Bay, Howick
Auckland / NL
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2009/08]Swinkels, Bart Willem
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date07747438.514.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007NL50214
Priority number, dateEP2006011425619.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114256
EP2006011424619.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114246
EP2006011425019.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114250
EP2006011426119.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114261
EP2006011427519.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114275
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136253
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024486
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024486
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C12C11/07, C12G3/00, C12C11/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/06]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesHR19.11.2008
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HEFEVERGORENER GETRÄNKE[2009/08]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING YEAST FERMENTED BEVERAGES[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BOISSONS FERMENTÉES À LA LEVURE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2008National basic fee paid 
19.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
07.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2015Fee for grant paid
04.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.06.2010
Opposition(s)11.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.05.2007
AT10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]HU14.05.2007
AT10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU14.05.2007
AT10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/38]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/13]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/04]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
LU14.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
Former [2016/35]FI10.02.2016
Cited inInternational search[DX]US3234026  (WILLIAM COUTTS MORTON) [DX] 1-12 * column 3, line 21 - column 7, line 42 * * claims 1-31 * * figures 2,3,6 *;
 [A]DE4430905  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 52 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]GB2197341  (BASS PLC) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-9 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO0168796  (MILLER BREWING [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 24 * * page 13, line 12 - page 17, line 2 *;
 [A]DE3514958  (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * claims 1-10 *
 [A]  - POLLOCK J R A, "Malt and fermentation", DATABASE FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 89-1-10-h0031, XP002403285 [A] 1-12 * abstract *
    [] - POLLOCK J R A, "Malt and fermentation", FERMENT, FERMENT 1988, (1988), vol. 1, no. 1, page 31,