Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026763

EP2026763 - A METHOD TO REDUCE THE SYMPTOMS OF HEARTBURN AND GASTRO-OESOPHAGEAL REFLUX DISEASE (GERD) BY SPECIFIC POLYSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Frutarom Netherlands B.V.
Galvanistraat 1
6716 AE Ede / NL
[2011/52]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Frutarom Netherlands B.V.
Landjuweel 5
3905 PE Veenendaal / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VERBRUGGEN, Maria Anna
Don Boscoweg 14
6871 DH Renkum / NL
02 / KELLY, Calvin T.
P.O. Box 3923
Regina, Saskatchewan S4P 3R8 / CA
03 / SUDOM, Blaine G.
P.O. Box 161
Avonlea, Saskatchewan S0H 0C0 / CA
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Hatzmann, Martin
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Hatzmann, Martin
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date07747448.416.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007NL50224
Priority number, dateEP2006007605616.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06076056
US20060806313P30.06.2006         Original published format: US 806313 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007133082
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026763
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026763
Date:29.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K31/715, A61K31/718, A61K31/722, A61K31/724, A61K31/731, A61K31/732, A61K31/738, A61K31/736
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER SYMPTOME VON SODBRENNEN UND GASTROÖSOPHAGEALER REFLUX-KRANKHEIT (GERD) DURCH SPEZIFISCHE POLYSACCHARIDE[2009/09]
English:A METHOD TO REDUCE THE SYMPTOMS OF HEARTBURN AND GASTRO-OESOPHAGEAL REFLUX DISEASE (GERD) BY SPECIFIC POLYSACCHARIDES[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DES SYMPTÔMES DE PYROSIS ET DE REFLUX GASTRO- SOPHAGIEN (RGO) PAR DES POLYSACCHARIDES SPÉCIFIQUES[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2008National basic fee paid 
25.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
11.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2011Fee for grant paid
18.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2010
Opposition(s)30.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.05.2007
AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
DK29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
ES10.10.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
DK29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
ES10.10.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2013/35]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
DK29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
ES10.10.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2013/29]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
DK29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
ES10.10.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2013/22]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
DK29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
ES10.10.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2012/31]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
DK29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2012/12]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2012/05]AT29.06.2011
BE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/50]FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/49]FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2349570  (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,15,16 * page 3, lines 11-27 * * page 4, lines 13-30 * * page 5, lines 8-10 * * page 8, lines 1-5 * * page 9, lines 1-24 * * page 13, lines 1-5 * * page 11, lines 19-24 * * page 26; claim 3 * [Y] 5,8;
 [Y]WO0166119  (RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE [GB], et al) [Y] 3-5,8,15,16 * page 6, lines 5-11,16-31 * * page 8, lines 1-7,26-28 * * page 11, lines 4-19 *;
 [A]EP0059221  (KYOSEI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2324725  (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03068246  (RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE [GB], et al) [A] 1-10,15,16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - BATCHELOR H K ET AL, "An in vitro mucosal model for prediction of the bioadhesion of alginate solutions to the oesophagus", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020515), vol. 238, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 123 - 132, XP002289236 [Y] 3-5,8,15,16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(02)00062-5