Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027421

EP2027421 - ENTHALPY EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Statiqcooling B.V.
Heliumstraat 8
7463 PL Rijssen / NL
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / UGES, Peter, Gerard, Hans
Prinsengracht 723
1017 JW Amsterdam / NL
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
[2015/33]
Former [2009/09]Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Application number, filing date07747458.321.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007NL50235
Priority number, dateNL2006200007922.05.2006         Original published format: NL 2000079
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136265
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027421
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027421
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:F24F5/00, F28D5/02
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTHALPIETAUSCHER[2009/09]
English:ENTHALPY EXCHANGER[2009/09]
French:ÉCHANGEUR D'ENTHALPIE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
18.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2015Fee for grant paid
30.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2015
Opposition(s)13.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
05.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.05.2007
AT12.08.2015
BG12.08.2015
CY12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU21.05.2007
AT12.08.2015
CY12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2018/28]HU21.05.2007
AT12.08.2015
CY12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
GR13.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT12.08.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003033826  (MORIGUCHI TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figures 1,4 *;
 [X]EP0661502  (JAPAN GORE TEX INC [JP]) [X] 1,5 * page 5, lines 26-33 * * page 8, lines 29-44 *;
 [X]WO2005040693  (OXYCELL HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 20; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2259541  (BALLARD JOHN R) [A] 1 * page 3, line 62 - page 4, line 26; figure 5 *;
 [A]WO0011422  (CHILL B V [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 15; figure 4 *;
 [DA]WO2005106343  (STATIQCOOLING B V [NL], et al) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document *