Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023904

EP2023904 - SUSTAINED RELEASE COATED TABLET WITH PRECISELY REGULATED RELEASE PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2012
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2012  [2012/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zaklady Farmaceutyczne "Polpharma" S.A.
ul. Pelpínska 19
PL-83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / MAZGALSKI, Jaroslaw
ul. Jowisza 2A/3
83-010 Straszyn / PL
02 / ROSS MALCOLM STEWART, Frank
Thannerstrasse 30
4054 Basel / CH
 [2009/17]
Former [2009/08]01 / MAZGALSKI, Jaroslaw
ul. Topazowa 3/2
80-180 Gdansk / PL
02 / ROSS MALCOLM STEWART, Frank
Thannerstrasse 30
4054 Basel / CH
Representative(s)Matyka, Malgorzata
Intellectual Property Affairs Polpharma SA ul. Pelplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
[2009/16]
Former [2009/08]Kruszewski, Adam Aleksander
Polpharma Biuro Handlowe ul. Bobrowiecka 6
00-728 Warszawa / PL
Application number, filing date07747745.301.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007PL00036
Priority number, datePL2006037983102.06.2006         Original published format: PL 37983106
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007142546
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023904
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K31/137, A61K31/445, A61K31/495
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERZOGENE TABLETTE MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG UND PRÄZISE REGULIERTEM FREISETZUNGSPROFIL[2009/08]
English:SUSTAINED RELEASE COATED TABLET WITH PRECISELY REGULATED RELEASE PROFILE[2009/08]
French:COMPRIMÉ ENROBÉ À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE AYANT UN PROFIL DE LIBÉRATION PRÉCISEMENT RÉGULÉ[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2008National basic fee paid 
24.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
28.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/25]
03.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
06.04.2009Request for further processing filed
06.04.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03057278  (IVAX RESEARCH INC [US]) [X] 1,3-23,25,26 * page 4, lines 22-24, paragraphs 9-18,36-41,43,46,47,55,56,69-72,74-95; claims 1-21; tables II,IV-VIII *;
 [X]US2004208927  (SAFADI MOHAMMED S [IL], et al) [X] 1,3-23,25,26 * page 6, column RIGHT, lines 1-3, paragraphs 67,70,80-93; tables I-V *;
 [Y]WO2004069234  (IPCA LAB LTD [IN], et al) [Y] 1,3-23,25,26 * page 7; examples 1-4; claims 1-21; tables 1-6 *;
 [Y]WO9961005  (ANDRX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1,3-23,25,26 * page 6, lines 22-27 * * page 7, lines 4-17 * * page 7, line 22 - page 12, line 10 * * page 10, lines 3-5; examples 1-5; tables 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2005074884  (KRKA TOVARNA ZDRAVIL D D NOVO [SI], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *