Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2012601

EP2012601 - A MOIST SNUFF NON-TOBACCO COMPOSITION AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swedish Match North Europe AB
118 85 Stockholm / SE
[2009/03]
Inventor(s)01 / ESSÉN Tomas
21 Providence Park
Holly Hill, South Hampton SO16 7QN / GB
02 / BRÄNNBERG, Tobias
Västerdalsvägen 43
448 91 Floda / SE
 [2010/45]
Former [2009/03]01 / ESSÉN Tomas
Dalhemsgatan 11
431 67 Mölndal / SE
02 / BRÄNNBERG, Tobias
Västerdalsvägen 43
448 91 Floda / SE
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2011/24]Nikolopoulou, Sofia , et al
Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2011/11]Linde, Jörgen , et al
Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2011/08]KIPA
Krahbichler Intellectual Property Advisors AB P.O. Box 1065
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2009/03]Lindberg, Berndt Ake
Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101
S-104 35 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date07748070.526.04.2007
[2009/03]
WO2007SE00405
Priority number, dateSE2006000095828.04.2006         Original published format: SE 0600958
[2009/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007126361
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2012601
Date:14.01.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2012601
Date:23.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:A24B15/18, A24B15/16, A24D1/18
[2010/10]
Former International [2009/03]A24B15/18, A24B15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/03]
TitleGerman:FEUCHTE SCHNUPFZUSAMMENSETZUNG OHNE TABAK UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2009/03]
English:A MOIST SNUFF NON-TOBACCO COMPOSITION AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF.[2009/03]
French:COMPOSITION HUMIDE A PRISER SANS TABAC ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION[2009/03]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2008National basic fee paid 
29.09.2008Search fee paid 
29.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/03]
04.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
06.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2012Fee for grant paid
27.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11182684.8  / EP2401927
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.02.2013  07.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
JTI Snus AB
Box 24155
104 51 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Isarpatent, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  25.02.2013  07.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
JTI Snus AB
Box 24155
104 51 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Isarpatent, et al
Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2013/14]
Opponent(s)01  25.02.2013   
JTI Snus AB
Box 24155
104 51 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Willquist, Sofia Ellinor, et al
Awapatent AB
Junkersgatan 1
582 35 Linköping / SE
12.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition23.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0053/16
26.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
18.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.04.2007
CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
TR23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
AT26.04.2016
FI26.04.2016
GB26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS01.11.2016
[2017/18]
Former [2017/10]HU26.04.2007
CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
TR23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
FI26.04.2016
GB26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
IS01.11.2016
Former [2017/08]HU26.04.2007
CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
TR23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
GB26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/37]HU26.04.2007
CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
TR23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
BE30.04.2016
Former [2015/34]HU26.04.2007
CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
TR23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
Former [2015/32]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
TR23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
Former [2015/13]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
MT23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
Former [2014/20]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
IE26.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
Former [2014/11]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
FR30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
MC23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2013/34]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
BG23.08.2012
GR24.08.2012
ES03.09.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2013/11]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
IT23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
PL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
GR24.08.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2013/10]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
RO23.05.2012
SK23.05.2012
GR24.08.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2013/09]CY23.05.2012
EE23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
GR24.08.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2013/08]CY23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
NL23.05.2012
GR24.08.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2013/01]CY23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
GR24.08.2012
PT24.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
LV23.05.2012
GR24.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY23.05.2012
LT23.05.2012
Former [2012/47]LT23.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[ID]US2004123873  (CALANDRO DANIEL [US], et al) [ID] 1-24 * page 1, lines 10-11, paragraph 10 * * page 2, lines 5-7, paragraph 15 * * page 4, lines 3-4 - paragraph 36 * * page 7, paragraphs 66-70 * * claims 1, 3, 15, 17, 19 *;
 [A]US2004118422  (LUNDIN JORGEN [SE], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 2, lines 10-11, paragraph 11 * * claim 8 *;
 [A]WO2004056218  (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 3 - lines 12-13 * * claims 10, 13 *;
 [A]US5417229  (SUMMERS JOHN K [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 6, lines 29, 32, 33 * * column 7, line 10 * * claims 1, 9 *;
 [AP]WO2007035486  (MOTTS LLP [US], et al) [AP] 1-24 * example 1 * * page 9, paragraph 45 * * page 25, line 3, paragraph 100 * * page 25, line 2, paragraph 101 * * page 25, lines 3-5, paragraph 102 * * page 26, line 1 * * page 26, lines 2-3 *
International search[A]US2002170567  (RIZZOTTO JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US4811746  (DAVIS LORI J [US]);
 [A]US4817640  (SUMMERS JOHN K [US])