Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027105

EP2027105 - NOVEL PROCESS FOR PREPARING INTERMEDIATES OF CCR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2012  [2012/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / AINGE, Debra
AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
02 / CORNWALL, Philip
AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
03 / GILL, Duncan Michael
AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
04 / KUMAR, Vinod
AstraZeneca R&D Bangalore P.O. Box 2409 H.A. Farm Post Office
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 024 / IN
05 / O'KEEFE, Philip
AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
06 / SINCLAIR, Rhona
AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
07 / VAZ, Luis-Manuel
AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
08 / WAY, Edward Laurence
AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB
 [2009/09]
Application number, filing date07748103.407.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007SE00439
Priority number, dateUS20060799574P10.05.2006         Original published format: US 799574 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007129960
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027105
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07D317/10, C07C205/06, C07C209/66, C07C211/46, C07C211/48, C07D303/22, A61K31/40, A61P29/00
[2011/15]
Former International [2009/09]C07D317/10, C07C205/06, C07C209/66, C07C211/46, C07C211/48, C07D303/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN AUS CCR-ANTAGONISTEN[2009/09]
English:NOVEL PROCESS FOR PREPARING INTERMEDIATES OF CCR ANTAGONISTS[2009/09]
French:NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ POUR PREPARER DES INTERMEDIAIRES DE CCR-ANTAGONISTES[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Search fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
15.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/15]
22.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0198273  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * page 14, compound (III);;; claim - *
International search[X]WO2005061499  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al);
 [A]EP0023725  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]);
 [A]WO03051839  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al)
 [X]  - YANG U.-S. ET AL., "A practical stereoselective synthesis of (S)-(-)-ofloxacin", CHINESE JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 539 - 544, XP008055041
 [X]  - ZORIN M. ET AL., OBSHCHEI KHIMII, (1990), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 1140 - 1144, XP003018662
 [X]  - SAJIKI H. ET AL., "Highly Chemoselective Hydrogenation with Retention of the Epoxide Function Using a Heterogeneous Pd/C-Ethylenediamine Catalyst and THF", CHEM. EUR. J., (2000), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 2200 - 2204, XP003018663

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3765(20000616)6:12<2200::AID-CHEM2200>3.0.CO;2-3