Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021253

EP2021253 - A METHOD OF SEALINGLY PACKING PIECE GOODS IN A BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]A METHOD OF SEALINGLY PACKING PIECE GOODS IN A BAG, AS WELL AS BAG UNITS ADAPTED HEREFOR
[2018/29]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pronova Aktiebolag
Olofsdalsvägen 26
302 41 Halmstad / SE
[2019/17]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Pronova Aktiebolag
Olofsdalsvägen 26
302 41 Halmstad / SE
Inventor(s)01 / JOSTLER, Johan
Pålsbovägen 11 E
S-302 74 Halmstad / SE
02 / JOSTLER, Jan
Trollebergsvägen 17
S-302 72 Halmstad / SE
03 / BERG, Sven, Olof
Stenbrottsvägen 9 A
S-310 42 Haverdal / SE
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[2019/17]
Former [2013/46]Tholén, Johan
Awapatent AB
Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2013/45]Ahlberg, Lena Camilla
AWAPATENT AB
Stortorget 17
252 20 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2009/07]Danfelter, Maria
Groth & Co i Malmö HB P.O. Box 6153
200 11 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date07748169.525.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007SE00505
Priority number, dateSE2006000116426.05.2006         Original published format: SE 0601164
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139465
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021253
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021253
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65B43/26, B65B51/18, B65D33/00
[2018/29]
Former International [2014/48]B65B43/26, B31B27/00, B65D33/00, B65B51/18
Former International [2009/07]B65B43/26, B31B27/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/17]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM DICHTEN VERPACKEN VON STÜCKGUT IN EINEM BEUTEL[2018/29]
English:A METHOD OF SEALINGLY PACKING PIECE GOODS IN A BAG[2018/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE ÉTANCHE DE MARCHANDISES EN PIÈCES DANS UN SAC[2018/29]
Former [2009/07]VERFAHREN ZUM DICHTEN VERPACKEN VON STÜCKGUT IN EINEM BEUTEL UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETE BEUTELEINHEITEN
Former [2009/07]A METHOD OF SEALINGLY PACKING PIECE GOODS IN A BAG, AS WELL AS BAG UNITS ADAPTED HEREFOR
Former [2009/07]PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE ÉTANCHE DE MARCHANDISES EN PIÈCES DANS UN SAC, ET ENSEMBLES SAC CONÇUS POUR UN TEL EMBALLAGE
Entry into regional phase17.12.2008National basic fee paid 
17.12.2008Search fee paid 
17.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2019Fee for grant paid
18.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
05.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
05.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
20.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
17.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]US4630311  (BENTSEN PER [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-3 *
International search[A]WO9419250  (MINIGRIP LTD [NZ], et al);
 [A]GB1463158  (SIEGEL K H);
 [A]WO03008272  (JOKER SYSTEM AB [SE], et al);
 [A]EP0798101  (WEISSENFLUH HAWE NEOS [CH]);
 [A]WO2005023693  (SESAM PLASTICS AB [SE], et al)
ExaminationCA1267121
by applicantWO03008272
 EP1414700
 WO2005023693
 US4630311
 CA1267121
 SE20060001163
 SE20060001164