Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021215

EP2021215 - OPERATION CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2013
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scania CV AB (publ)
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Scania CV AB (PUBL)
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / FRANSSON, Håkan
Granvägen 27
640 50 Björnlunda / SE
02 / BOSTRÖM, Richard
Tjäderspelsvägen 6B
155 30 Nykvarn / SE
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Waldebäck, Hans Olov
Scania CV AB
Patents, TY
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]Waldebäck, Hans Olov
Scania CV AB Patents, TY
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Former [2009/07]Waldebäck, Hans Olov
Scania CV AB Patents, TY
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date07748426.924.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007SE50265
Priority number, dateSE2006000116626.05.2006         Original published format: SE 0601166
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139482
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021215
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021215
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60T7/12, B60T8/00, B60T8/171, B60T8/58, B60T13/66, B60T13/74
[2011/11]
Former International [2009/07]B60T7/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:BETRIEBSSTEUERSYSTEM[2009/07]
English:OPERATION CONTROL SYSTEM[2009/07]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'OPÉRATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2008National basic fee paid 
17.12.2008Search fee paid 
17.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
04.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2012Fee for grant paid
25.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2011
Opposition(s)10.12.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.04.2007
AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
MT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
TR07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
LU24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
BG07.06.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
MT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
TR07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
LU24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
BG07.06.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
MT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
TR07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
BG07.06.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2013/35]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
MT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
BG07.06.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
BG07.06.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
IE24.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
GR08.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT07.03.2012
BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
GR08.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
MC30.04.2012
GR08.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
SK07.03.2012
MC30.04.2012
GR08.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
CZ07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
PL07.03.2012
RO07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
SI07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
IS07.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
EE07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
LV07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI07.03.2012
LT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT07.03.2012
NL07.03.2012
Former [2012/33]LT07.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0208012  (EATON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,7,13,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1375278  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,13,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19954807  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,7,13,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1327553  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2833542  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004067309  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,13,17,18 * the whole document *
International search[A]EP1375278  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0392732  (EATON CORP [US]);
 [A]WO0208012  (EATON CORP [US], et al);
 [A]EP1359336  (ZF SACHS AG [DE])