Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024702

EP2024702 - HEAT EXCHANGER PLATE AND PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alfa Laval Corporate AB
Box 73
22100 Lund / SE
[2017/10]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Alfa Laval Corporate AB
Box 73
22100 Lund / SE
Inventor(s)01 / GUSTAFSSON, Helén
Åkerlyckan 60
S-245 37 Staffanstorp / SE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Alfa Laval Attorneys
Alfa Laval Corporate AB
Patent Department
P.O. Box 73
221 00 Lund / SE
[2017/10]
Former [2009/08]Berglund, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date07748457.430.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007SE50296
Priority number, dateSE2006000124405.06.2006         Original published format: SE 0601244
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007142590
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024702
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024702
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:F28F3/08, F28D9/00, F28F3/10, // F28F3/04
[2014/05]
Former International [2009/08]F28F3/08, F28D9/00, F28F3/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/10]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHERPLATTE UND PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER[2009/08]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER PLATE AND PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER[2009/08]
French:PLAQUE D'ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE À PLAQUES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2008National basic fee paid 
10.11.2008Search fee paid 
10.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
13.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2017Fee for grant paid
23.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2016
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
IE30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
LU30.04.2017
MT30.04.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/23]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
IE30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
LU30.04.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/13]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
LU30.04.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3141161  (SCHMIDT W GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10-11 * abstract * [A] 5-9;
 [X]GB1035170  (SERCK RADIATORS LTD) [X] 1-4,10-11 * page 2, column 1; figure 2 *;
 [I]DE69814042T  (ALFA LAVAL CORPORATE AB LUND [SE]) [I] 1-4 * page 7, line 18 - line 28; figures 5,7,8 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 9 *;
 [A]WO2006042405  (DANA CANADA CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]DE60005529T  (APV NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3, 5 *;
 [A]GB2128726  (APV CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005010341  (ALFA LAVAL CORPORATE AB LUND [SE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[A]DE19917761  (REHBERG PETER [DE], et al);
 [A]US2550339  (EHRMAN HERBERT H);
 [A]GB2107845  (SCHMIDT W GMBH & CO);
 [A]GB1035170  (SERCK RADIATORS LTD);
 [A]DE10211368  (MANDO CLIMATE CONTROL CORP CHU [KR]);
 [A]JPH08271180
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 01, Database accession no. 1997-002345, XP008093167 & JPH08271180 A 19961018 (SEISAKUSHO KK)
by applicantDE3141161
 GB1035170
 GB2107845
 DE69814042T