Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021844

EP2021844 - WDM-BASED SENSOR SYSTEM AND SENSOR INTERROGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agency for Science, Technology and Research
20 Biopolis Way, No. 07-01 Centros
Singapore 138668 / SG
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HAO, Jianzhong
Institute for Infocomm Research 21 Heng Mui Keng Terrace
Singapore 119613 / SG
02 / TAKAHASHI, Shiro
Institute for Infocomm Research 21 Heng Mui Keng Terrace
Singapore 119613 / SG
03 / CAI, Zhaohui
Institute for Infocomm Research 21 Heng Mui Keng Terrace
Singapore 119613 / SG
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07748674.408.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007SG00129
Priority number, dateUS20060799038P09.05.2006         Original published format: US 799038 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007129993
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021844
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/10, G02F2/00, G01B11/16, H04J14/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:WDM-GESTÜTZTES SENSORSYSTEM UND SENSORABFRAGESYSTEM[2009/07]
English:WDM-BASED SENSOR SYSTEM AND SENSOR INTERROGATION SYSTEM[2009/07]
French:SYSTEME DETECTEUR A MODULATION PAR REPARTITION EN LONGUEUR D'ONDE ET SYSTEME D'INTERROGATION DE DETECTEURS[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/25]
22.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]CN1737676  (UNIV TIANJIN [CN]);
 [A]JP2005091165  (KYOCERA CORP);
 [A]WO03106929  (LIGHT STRUCTURES AS [NO], et al);
 [A]US2002025097  (COOPER DAVID J F [CA], et al)