Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019582

EP2019582 - SYSTEM FOR BALE HANDLING AND ACCUMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2013  [2013/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heitz, Arthur Jr.
12633 Caroline Place
Nemo, SD 57759 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date07748980.519.01.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US01386
Priority number, dateWO2006US1629727.04.2006         Original published format: PCT/US2006/016297
US20060840375P25.08.2006         Original published format: US 840375 P
[2010/45]
Former [2009/33]WO2006US0001627.04.2006
US20060840375P25.08.2006
Former [2009/06]US20060840375P25.08.2006
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007126451
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019582
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.08.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01D7/04, A01D90/00
[2012/33]
Former International [2009/06]A01D7/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM HANDHABEN UND ANSAMMELN VON BALLEN[2009/06]
English:SYSTEM FOR BALE HANDLING AND ACCUMULATION[2009/06]
French:SYSTEME DE MANIPULATION ET D'ACCUMULATION DE BALLES[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Search fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
19.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/35]
26.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2263433  (FIELD LESLIE FREDERICK [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,10-12,15 * page 5, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 4; figures 1-6 *
International search[X]US2002184870  (SPANIOL PHILLIP G [US], et al);
 [Y]US4951452  (LUNDAHL E CORDELL [US], et al);
 [Y]US4042140  (MCFARLAND DOUGLAS F);
 [Y]US6164683  (KALMAN FRANK [US])