Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024028

EP2024028 - SYSTEM FOR TRANSCUTANEOUS ENERGY TRANSFER TO AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE WITH MATING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway NE
Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US
[2013/30]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway NE
Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Medtronic Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway NE
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TORGERSON, Nathan, A.
13618 Bittersweet Street NW
Andover, MN 55304 / US
02 / KAST, John, E.
10815 - 140th Street North
Hugo, MN 55038 / US
03 / KELLY, Kevin, J.
4862 Cumberland Street
Shoreview, MN 55126 / US
04 / GOBLISH, Todd, P.
8051 Terraceview Lane
Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2013/30]
Former [2009/08]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07749095.123.01.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US01770
Priority number, dateUS2006041415128.04.2006         Original published format: US 414151
US2006059043131.10.2006         Original published format: US 590431
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007126454
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024028
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024028
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/372, // A61N1/378
[2013/12]
Former International [2009/08]A61N1/378, A61N1/375
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM FÜR DEN TRANSKUTANEN ENERGIETRANSFER ZU EINEM IMPLANTIERBAREN MEDIZINPRODUKT MIT ZUSAMMENPASSENDEN ELEMENTEN[2009/08]
English:SYSTEM FOR TRANSCUTANEOUS ENERGY TRANSFER TO AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE WITH MATING ELEMENTS[2009/08]
French:SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT D'ENERGIE TRANSCUTANE A UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE AVEC ELEMENTS D'ACCOUPLEMENT[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2008National basic fee paid 
27.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2013Fee for grant paid
12.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2011
Opposition(s)25.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2007
AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
TR24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
GB23.01.2014
IE23.01.2014
LU23.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU23.01.2007
AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
GB23.01.2014
IE23.01.2014
LU23.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/25]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
GB23.01.2014
IE23.01.2014
LU23.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/07]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
GB23.01.2014
IE23.01.2014
LU23.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/51]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
GB23.01.2014
LU23.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/46]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
LU23.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
LU23.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT24.07.2013
PT25.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[XD]US2005075700  (SCHOMMER MARK E [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,6-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0070] - [0073]; figures 9-11 *;
 [X]GB2239802  (UNIV OTTAWA [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,14 * page 8, lines 13-15; figure 3 *;
 [X]US6477425  (NOWICK MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11,14 * column 3, lines 41-59; figure 3 *;
 [X]US5279292  (BAUMANN JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,14 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 9; figure 3 *;
 [X]WO9906108  (MANN ALFRED E FOUND SCIENT RES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * page 8, lines 26-33 *;
 [A]US5314453  (JEUTTER DEAN C [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, lines 41-62; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2006016452  (GOETZ STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005107841  (MEADOWS PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0215] *;
 [A]US5948006  (MANN CARLA M [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, lines 31-35 *;
 [A]US5690693  (WANG XINTAO [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 4, lines 37-46 *
by applicantUS5411537
 US5690693
 US5733313
 US6308101
 US6324430
 US6516227
 US6505077
 EP1048324
 WO0183029
 WO0197908
 GB2239802
 US6477425
 US5279292
 WO9906108