Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2010987

EP2010987 - COMPUTING DEVICE ANTENNA IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Change - applicantpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2009/02]For all designated states
HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.
Hewlett-Packard Company Intellectual Property Administration 20555 S.H. 249
Houston TX 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOMER, Steven, S.
20555 Tomball Parkway
Houston, TX 77070 / US
02 / DOCZY, Paul, J.
20555 Tomball Parkway
Houston, TX 77070 / US
03 / NEILL, Timothy
20555 Tomball Parkway
Houston, TX 77070 / US
04 / WALKER, Paul, N.
20555 Tomball Parkway
Houston, TX 77070 / US
 [2009/02]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2009/02]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date07749805.301.02.2007
[2009/02]
WO2007US02876
Priority number, dateUS2006041236827.04.2006         Original published format: US 412368
[2009/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007130183
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2010987
Date:07.01.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2009/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2009/25]
Former [2009/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON RECHNERANTENNEN[2009/02]
English:COMPUTING DEVICE ANTENNA IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2009/02]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'ANTENNE PAR UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE[2009/02]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2008National basic fee paid 
14.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/02]
28.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1405/14
21.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[I]EP0987618  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0077]; figure 23 *;
 [I]WO0065445  (PALM INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 29 - page 7, line 7 * * page 10, line 23 - page 16, line 29; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO9942997  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0622794  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1503450  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0987618