Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1986819

EP1986819 - METHOD OF MAKING AN ABRASIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING A NON-POROUS ABRASIVE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 22.04.2015  [2015/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LE NORMAND, Jean
Boulevard de L'Oise
F-95006 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Lanoe, Benjamin , et al
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne , et al
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2014/17]Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. , et al
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2011/21]Towlson, Samantha Jayne , et al
3M Europe S.A./N.V. Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2010/32]Towlson, Samantha Jayne
3M Europe S.A./N.V. Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2009/42]Hill, Cecilia Ann
3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB
Former [2008/45]Hill, Cecilia Ann
3M Europe S.A. OIPC Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date07750435.509.02.2007
[2008/45]
WO2007US03598
Priority number, dateGB2006000327617.02.2006         Original published format: GB 0603276
[2008/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007097932
Date:30.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1986819
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007
[2008/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.10.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:B24D13/02, B24D18/00, B29C45/14
[2010/51]
Former International [2008/45]B24D5/00, B24D18/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHLEIFARTIKELS MIT NICHTPORÖSEM SCHLEIFELEMENT[2008/45]
English:METHOD OF MAKING AN ABRASIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING A NON-POROUS ABRASIVE ELEMENT[2008/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE ABRASIF COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT ABRASIF NON POREUX[2008/45]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2008National basic fee paid 
28.08.2008Search fee paid 
28.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/45]
10.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/17]
20.02.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/17]
Appeal following examination30.04.2013Appeal received No.  T1555/13
01.07.2013Statement of grounds filed
20.02.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
20.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4054425  (SHERMAN WILLIAM F) [X] 1,4,9,10 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 38; figure - * [Y] 2,3,5-8,11;
 [XY]US4774788  (SHACHAM AMNON [IL] ET AL) [X] 1,4,9,10 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 45; figure - * [Y] 2,3,5-8,11;
 [Y]US4448590  (WRAY DANIEL J [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,3,5 * column 4, lines 31-54; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5849646  (STOUT GEORGE MATTHEW [US] ET AL) [Y] 6,7 * figure 4 *;
 [Y]  - 3M, "Radial Bristle Discs", (20011022), URL: http://multimedia.3m.com/mws/mediawebserver?mwsId=66666UuZjcFSLXTtlXMXlXMcEVuQEcuZgVs6EVs6E666666--, (20101110), XP002608845 [Y] 8,11 * the whole document *
International search[A]JPH11320423  ;
 [A]EP0790880  ;
 [A]US2001011108  ;
 [A]EP0554806