blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1986819 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1986819



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 325
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
12.03.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
03.03.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 13
03.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.02.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.02.2015 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
16.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.01.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
10.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
09.12.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.12.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 11
04.12.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.12.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
01.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
01.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
21.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
21.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 3
23.09.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.07.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.07.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
01.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.07.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
01.07.2013 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Claims Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.07.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
30.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.04.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.03.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.03.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.03.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 2
01.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.03.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 12
01.03.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
01.03.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
01.03.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
01.03.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
28.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.02.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.02.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
07.01.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
31.07.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
24.07.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.07.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.07.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.07.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.11.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.11.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.08.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
28.04.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.04.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 2
23.11.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
09.07.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.06.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
09.06.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
08.10.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.09.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.09.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
28.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.08.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
04.07.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.06.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
18.10.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.10.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
18.09.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
30.08.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 22