blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1986819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.03.2015 Refusal of application published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
25.02.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.02.2015 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
14.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2015 Change - representative
05.12.2014 Change: Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2014 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.04.2014 Change - representative published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
21.03.2014 Change - representative published on  23.04.2014  [2014/17]
15.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2013 Change: Appeal number
02.07.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
10.05.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
10.05.2013 New entry: Appeal number
20.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2013 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
27.02.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.02.2013 Change: Despatch of communication that application is refused
12.07.2012 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2012 Change - extension states published on  08.08.2012  [2012/32]
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.11.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.08.2011 First examination report
02.08.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.06.2011 Amendment by applicant
22.04.2011 Change - representative published on  25.05.2011  [2011/21]
18.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.11.2010 Supplementary search report published on  22.12.2010  [2010/51]
19.11.2010 Change - classification published on  22.12.2010  [2010/51]
19.11.2010 Change - classification published on  22.12.2010  [2010/51]
09.07.2010 Change - representative published on  11.08.2010  [2010/32]
02.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2009 Change - representative published on  14.10.2009  [2009/42]
06.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
03.10.2008 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
27.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2008 Amendment by applicant
29.08.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2008 Change - applicant published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
07.11.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
01.09.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication