blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1986819

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
NL 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure20.02.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/17]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2008National basic fee paid 
28.08.2008Search fee paid 
28.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Appeal following examination30.04.2013APPEAL FILED
01.07.2013APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
20.02.2015APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20080828
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:22.12.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B24D 13/02 20060101AFI20101112BHEP
 
Event date:22.12.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B24D 18/00 20060101ALI20101112BHEP
 
Event date:22.12.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 45/14 20060101ALI20101112BHEP
 
Event date:22.12.2010 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20101123
 
Event date:07.09.2011 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20110804
 
Event date:08.08.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:20.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R003
Code Expl.:-REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:APPLICATION REFUSED
Effective DATE:20150220