Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2111268

EP2111268 - ABDOMINAL EXERCISE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ab Coaster Holdings, Inc
1007 Orange St.
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
[2010/09]
Former [2009/44]For all designated states
Ab Coaster Holdings, Inc
1007 Orange St.
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
For all designated states
Brown, Wallace
21 North Gate Road
Mendham, NJ 07945 / US
For all designated states
Nelson, Robert W.
3010 Persimmon Place
Rowlett, TX 75088 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Wallace
21 North Gate Road
Mendham, NJ 07945 / US
02 / NELSON, Robert W.
3010 Persimmon Place
Rowlett, TX 75088 / US
 [2009/44]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[2012/10]
Former [2011/38]Wilson Gunn
5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester
M3 2JA / GB
Former [2011/33]Wilson Gunn
5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester
M3 2JA / GB
Former [2009/44]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date07750970.115.02.2007
[2009/44]
WO2007US04173
Priority number, dateUS2006060774530.11.2006         Original published format: US 607745
[2009/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008066559
Date:05.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2111268
Date:28.10.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008
[2009/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2111268
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A63B26/00, A63B21/00
[2009/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/44]
TitleGerman:BAUCHMUSKELTRAININGSVORRICHTUNG[2009/44]
English:ABDOMINAL EXERCISE DEVICE[2009/44]
French:DISPOSITIF D'EXERCICE ABDOMINAL[2009/44]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2009National basic fee paid 
30.06.2009Search fee paid 
30.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
29.10.2009Observations by third parties
23.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2011Fee for grant paid
21.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2010
Opposition(s)22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2007
AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
LU15.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
LU15.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/22]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/49]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/42]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/35]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]CA2272167  (PRSALA JAN J P [CA]) [X] 1,3-4,8-9,18 * page 3 - page 11; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,5;
 [YA]US2006166798  (NELSON ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 2,5 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,3-4,8-9,18;
 [A]US4930769  (NENOFF JOSEPH R [US]) [A] 1,3-4,8-9,18 * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,2 *
International search[AP]US7083556  (MISKECH);
 [A]US6645129  (ESCHENBACH);
 [A]US5746688  (PRAGER)
otherDE7930162U