Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1991651

EP1991651 - SURFACE ACTIVE BLEACH AT DYNAMIC PH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/47]SURFACE ACTIVE BLEACH AND DYNAMIC PH
[2013/21]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2013/16]
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Danisco US Inc.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONCAR, Edward M.
Genencor International, Inc.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
02 / ESTELL, David A.
Genencor International, Inc.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
03 / OH, Hiroshi
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / POULOSE, Ayrookaran J.
Genencor International, Inc.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
 [2013/44]
Former [2008/47]01 / CONCAR, Edward M.
Genencor International, Inc. 925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
02 / ESTELL, David A.
Genencor International, Inc. 925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
03 / OH, Hiroshi
The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / POULOSE, Ayrookaran J.
Genencor International, Inc. 925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Representative(s)Russell, Tim , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2008/47]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date07751097.216.02.2007
[2008/47]
WO2007US04312
Priority number, dateUS20060779130P02.03.2006         Original published format: US 779130 P
[2008/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007106293
Date:20.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1991651
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007
[2008/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1991651
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/386, C11D1/74, C11D1/66, C11D3/20, C11D3/22
[2008/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AKTIVES BLEICHEN VON OBERFLÄCHEN BEI DYNAMISCHEM PH-WERT[2013/21]
English:SURFACE ACTIVE BLEACH AT DYNAMIC PH[2013/21]
French:BLANCHIMENT ACTIF EN SURFACE EN PH DYNAMIQUE[2013/21]
Former [2008/47]OBERFLÄCHENAKTIVE BLEICHUNG MIT DYNAMISCHEM PH-WERT
Former [2008/47]SURFACE ACTIVE BLEACH AND DYNAMIC PH
Former [2008/47]AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT ACTIF EN SURFACE ET PH DYNAMIQUE
Entry into regional phase05.09.2008National basic fee paid 
05.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/47]
29.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2013Fee for grant paid
05.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2014   
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2014/36]
08.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.08.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition30.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2256/16
12.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2256/16
07.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.09.2012Request for further processing filed
24.09.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.01.2011Request for further processing filed
21.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.02.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.02.2007
AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
GR31.01.2014
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU16.02.2007
AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
GR31.01.2014
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2016/28]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
GR31.01.2014
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2016/25]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2015/14]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
IE16.02.2014
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
LU16.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
LU16.02.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/41]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/38]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/37]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/36]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/28]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/26]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/25]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/23]BE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
Former [2014/20]LT30.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005056782  (GENENCOR INT [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * figures 21-23,8; examples 17-27; claims 134-166 *;
 [X]US2005281773  (WIELAND SUSANNE [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-16,18,19 * page 7; examples 5,6; claim - *;
 [DX]US5108457  (POULOSE AYROOKARAM J [US], et al) [DX] 1-5,7-16,18,19 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US5364554  (STANISLOWSKI ANNA G [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-16,18,19 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO0057022  (CLEANSORB LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * page 5; claim - *;
 [X]DE2557623  (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [X] 1-3,6,12-21 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2004053803  (LYE JASON [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12-21 * example -; claim - *;
 [PX]WO2006119060  (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * page 28 - page 29; example - * * page 2; claim - *;
 [PX]WO2006131503  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-3,6,12-21 * paragraph [0044]; example -; claim - *;
 [E]WO2007044667  (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * page 18 - page 19; example -; claim - *
by applicantWO2005056782
 WO2005028177
 DE2557623
 US2004053803
 US5364554
 WO0057022
 WO2006119060
 WO2007044667