Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1999653

EP1999653 - TRAINING A RANKING FUNCTION USING PROPAGATED DOCUMENT RELEVANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2008/50]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Jue
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / LI, Mingjing
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / MA, Wei-Ying
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / LI, Zhiwei
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2008/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07751873.627.02.2007
[2008/50]
WO2007US05141
Priority number, dateUS2006036457627.02.2006         Original published format: US 364576
[2008/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007100844
Date:07.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1999653
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007
[2008/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.09.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F17/21
[2008/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/50]
TitleGerman:TRAINIEREN EINER RANGFUNKTION UNTER VERWENDUNG VERBREITETER DOKUMENTRELEVANZ[2008/50]
English:TRAINING A RANKING FUNCTION USING PROPAGATED DOCUMENT RELEVANCE[2008/50]
French:APPRENTISSAGE D'UNE FONCTION DE CLASSEMENT FAISANT APPEL À UNE PERTINENCE DOCUMENTAIRE PROPAGÉE[2008/50]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2008National basic fee paid 
26.09.2008Search fee paid 
26.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2017
14.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination24.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1777/17
24.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]  - FENG JING ET AL, "Keyword propagation for image retrieval", PROCEEDINGS - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS - 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS - PROCEEDINGS; VOLUME I OF V: ANALOG SIGNAL PROCESSING 2004 INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS INC. US,, (20040523), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-8251-0, pages 53 - 56, XP010720016 [I] 1-15 * Chapters 2 and 3 *
 [AD]  - HE J AND LI M AND ZHANG H-J AND TONG H AND ZHANG C, "Manifold-ranking based image retrieval", Proceedings of the 12th annual ACM international conference on Multimedia, New York, NY, USA, ISBN 1-58113-893-8, (20041010), pages 9 - 16, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1027531, (20100204), XP002567139 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BURGES C, "Ranking as learning structured outputs", INTERNET CITATION, (20051202), pages 7 - 11, URL: http://web.mit.edu/shivani/www/Ranking-NIPS-05/Proceedings/proceeding s-nips05workshop-ranking.pdf, (20100114), XP007911133 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANDREW TROTMAN, "Learning to Rank", INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20050101), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 1573-7659, pages 359 - 381, XP019207476 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10791-005-6991-7
 [A]  - BURGES C ET AL, "Learning to rank using gradient descent", INTERNET CITATION, (20050601), URL: http://research.microsoft.com/en-us/um/people/cburges/papers/ICML_ran king.pdf, (20100114), XP007911132 [A] 1-15 * Chapters 1 and 2 *
International search[A]US6691108  (LI WEN-SYAN [US]);
 [A]US2004215606  (COSSOCK DAVID [US]);
 [A]US6944609  (WITBROCK MICHAEL J [US])
 [Y]  - TAO QIN ET AL., "A Study of Relevance Propagation for Web Search", SIGIR'05, SALVADOR, BRAZIL, (20050819), XP002361686

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1076034.1076105
 [Y]  - FENG JING ET AL., "Keyword propagation for image retrieval", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2004. ISCAS '04. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 INTERNATION SYMPOSIUM, (20040526), vol. 2, pages 53 - 56, XP010720116
 [A]  - HOON YUL BANG ET AL., "Semantic propagation from relevance feedbacks", ICME '04. 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (20040630), vol. 1, pages 81 - 84, XP010770749

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2004.1394130
by applicant   - FENG JING ET AL., "Keyword propagation for image retrieval" PROCEEDINGS - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS - 2004", ANALOG SIGNAL PROCESSING 2004 IEEE, (20040523), vol. 2, pages 53 - 56
    - BURGES C, "Ranking as learning structured outputs", INTERNET CITATION, (20051202), pages 7 - 11, XP007911133
    - "Learning to Rank", ANDREW TROTMAN, INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (20050101), vol. 8, pages 359 - 381