Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1994696

EP1994696 - WIRELESS MESH NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.09.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rosemount, Inc.
12001 Technology Drive
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2008/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ORTH, Kelly, M.
c/o Rosemount Inc. 12001 Technology Drive
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
 [2008/48]
Representative(s)Elsworth, Dominic Stephen , et al
Hargreaves Elsworth
26 Northumberland Square
North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Elsworth, Dominic Stephen , et al
Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne
NE1 4XF / GB
Former [2008/48]Elsworth, Dominic Stephen , et al
Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square
GB-Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB
Application number, filing date07751936.128.02.2007
[2008/48]
WO2007US05205
Priority number, dateUS20060779488P06.03.2006         Original published format: US 779488 P
[2008/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007103089
Date:13.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1994696
Date:26.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007
[2008/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.06.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04L12/28
[2008/48]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [2009/05]
Former [2008/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE MASCHENNETZE[2008/48]
English:WIRELESS MESH NETWORKS[2008/48]
French:RESEAUX MAILLES SANS FIL[2008/48]
Entry into regional phase06.10.2008National basic fee paid 
06.10.2008Search fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/05]
02.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
16.08.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.01.2017Appeal received No.  T1228/17
28.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200903   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2009
28.02.201004   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2010
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0141348  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-6,9-15,18,19 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 8, line 8 * * page 9, line 20 - page 17, line 24 * * page 31, line 6 - page 32, line 9 * * page 33, line 4 - line 15 * [I] 7,8,16,17,20;
 [XAI]WO9914898  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11,14,15,18,19 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 11 * * page 5, line 6 - page 10, line 23 * [A] 3,4,12,13 [I] 7,8,16,17,20;
 [XAI]  - NIKLAS JOHANSSON ET AL, "JUMP Mode - A Dynamic Window-based Scheduling Framework for Bluetooth Scatternets", MOBIHOC '01 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MOBILE AD HOC NETWORKING & COMPUTING, (20010101), pages 204 - 211, XP002224705 [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11,14,15,18,19 * abstract * * 1. INTRODUCTION 2. RELATED WORK 3. JUMP MODE; page 204, column 1, line 30 - page 206, column 1, line 32 * [A] 3,4,12,13 [I] 7,8,16,17,20
International search[X]US2004208152  ;
 [X]WO2005099196  ;
 [Y]WO0245360  ;
 [A]US2006039298  ;
 [E]US2007206616
 [Y]  - CHUGH SHRUTI ET AL., "An Energy Efficient Collaborative Framework for Event Notification in Wireless Sensor Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 28TH ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS (LCN'03), (20031020), XP010666005

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.2003.1243169