Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1998829

EP1998829 - Mems device for delivery of therapeutic agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/50]MEMS DEVICE FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS
[2010/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
3740 McClintock Ave, Hughes Center EEB 131
Los Angeles, CA 90089-2561 / US
[2008/50]
Inventor(s)01 / MENG, Ellis
520 Palo Verde Avenue
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
02 / AGRAWAL, Rajat
77D Price Street
Redlands, CA 92373 / US
03 / HUMAYUN, Mark S.
2757 Sleepy Hollow Place
Glendale, CA 91206 / US
04 / TAI, Yu-Chong
3191 East California Boulevard
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
05 / LO, Ronalee
231 N. Nicholson Avenue
Monterey Park, CA 91755 / US
06 / SHIH, Jason
20420 Via Cadiz
Yorba Linda, CA 92885 / US
07 / RODGER, Damien
817 Temple Terrace
Los Angeles, CA 90042 / US
08 / KUWAHARA, Kenrick
5719 Ostin Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US
09 / LI, Po-Ying
2715 S. Hoover Street Apt. 2
Los Angeles, CA 90007 / US
10 / CHEN, Po-Jui
575 S Rengstorff Ave., Apt 31
Mountain View CA 94040 / US
 [2009/06]
Former [2008/50]01 / MENG, Ellis
520 Palo Verde Avenue
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
02 / AGRAWAL, Rajat
77D Price Street
Redlands, CA 92373 / US
03 / HUMAYUN, Mark S.
2757 Sleepy Hollow Place
Glendale, CA 91206 / US
04 / TAI, Yu-Chong
3191 East California Boulevard
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
05 / LO, Ronalee
231 N. Nicholson Avenue
Monterey Park, CA 91755 / US
06 / SHIH, Jason
20420 Via Cadiz
Yorba Linda, CA 92885 / US
07 / RODGER, Damien
817 Temple Terrace
Los Angeles, CA 90042 / US
08 / KUWAHARA, Kenrick
5719 Ostin Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US
09 / LI, Po-Ying
2715 S. Hoover Street Apt. 2
Los Angeles, CA 90007 / US
10 / CHEN, Po-Jui
1001 East Villa Street
Pasadena, CA 91106 / US
Representative(s)Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date07753177.014.03.2007
[2008/50]
WO2007US06530
Priority number, dateUS20060781969P14.03.2006         Original published format: US 781969 P
[2008/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007106557
Date:20.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1998829
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007
[2008/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1998829
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142, A61M31/00, A61F9/00, F15C5/00
[2008/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mems-Vorrichtung zur Wirkstofffreisetzung[2010/33]
English:Mems device for delivery of therapeutic agents[2010/33]
French:Dispositif Mems et procede de livraison d'agents therapeutiques[2010/33]
Former [2008/50]MEMS-VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG
Former [2008/50]MEMS DEVICE FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS
Former [2008/50]DISPOSITIF MEMS ET PROCEDE DE LIVRAISON D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES
Entry into regional phase13.10.2008National basic fee paid 
13.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
29.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2010Fee for grant paid
22.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11153615.7  / EP2319558
EP11153618.1  / EP2316505
Opposition(s)10.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
HU09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
LU14.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
LU14.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2013/33]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
LU14.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2013/25]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
LU14.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/24]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/12]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/07]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/05]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/49]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/47]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/38]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/37]BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0166173  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 22 - page 9, line 13; figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]US5725017  (ELSBERRY DENNIS D [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10 * the whole document * [A] 9;
 [X]DE3915708  (MEDIZIN LABORTECHNIK VEB K [DD]) [X] 1,5,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2002103412  (TRIMMER WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9938552  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-5,7 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 11; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO9917749  (IEP GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 16 * * page 26, line 21 - page 31, line 9; figure 5 *;
 [A]WO0156634  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 11 - page 8, line 29; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US2005187515  (VARRICHIO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-4 *
by applicantWO0166173
 US5725017
 DE3915708
 US2002103412
    - Dictionary of Scientific and Technical Terms, MCGRAW-HILL