EP1998862 - NETWORK DEVICE VALIDATION AND INTEGRITY MAINTENANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, California 94404 / US | ||
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 919 Hillsdale Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Boulevard, 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Adam c/o Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Steve c/o Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07753269.5 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US06628 | Priority number, date | US20060386039 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 386039 | US20060415881 | 01.05.2006 Original published format: US 415881 | US20060449141 | 07.06.2006 Original published format: US 449141 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007109130 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998862 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/24, A63F13/00, G06F17/00, G06F19/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
A63F13/75 (US);
A63F13/30 (EP,US);
A63F13/45 (US);
G07F17/3241 (EP,US);
A63F2300/5586 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | A63F9/24 | ||
Former IPC [2008/50] | A63F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | ÜBERPRÜFUNG UND INTEGRITÄTSERHALTUNG EINER NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2008/50] | English: | NETWORK DEVICE VALIDATION AND INTEGRITY MAINTENANCE | [2008/50] | French: | VALIDATION DE DISPOSITIF DE RESEAU ET MAINTENANCE D'INTEGRITE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 11.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | Appeal following examination | 09.02.2018 | Appeal received No. T1204/18 | 23.04.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.04.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP20186021.0 / EP3753611 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2003195025 (HILL OTHO DALE [US]); | [Y]US2004193919 (DABBISH EZZAT A [US], et al) | [X] - "PunkBuster Server Manual", pages 1 - 2, 5 - 7, 16 - 18, URL: http://www.web.archive.org/web/20020211181729/http://www.evenbalance.com/pbmanual/serveman.htm | by applicant | US2002138637 | US2003195025 | US2004193919 | US2007238524 | US20030700777 | US20030700797 | US20030700798 | US20030701014 | US20030701298 | US20030701302 |