Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1993652

EP1993652 - SYSTEM FOR ADMINISTERING REDUCED PRESSURE TREATMENT HAVING A MANIFOLD WITH A PRIMARY FLOW PASSAGE AND A BLOCKAGE PREVENTION MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.09.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Former [2008/48]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
PO Box 659508
Texas Sam Antonio 78265- 9508 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORNET, Douglas, A.
502 Pueblo Vista
San Antonio, TX 78258 / US
02 / MANWARING, Michael
16703 Weyburn
San Antonio, TX 78248 / US
03 / SWAIN, Larry, D.
12519 Elm Country Lane
San Antonio, TX 78230 / US
04 / KAGAN, Jonathan
200 Homedale Road
Hopkins, MN 55343 / US
 [2008/48]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Cordina, Kevin John , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2012/13]Ashton, Timothy , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2010/38]Ashton, Timothy , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2008/48]Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07753287.714.03.2007
[2008/48]
WO2007US06647
Priority number, dateUS20060782171P14.03.2006         Original published format: US 782171 P
US2007072407213.03.2007         Original published format: US 724072
[2009/03]
Former [2008/48]US20060782171P14.03.2006
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007106590
Date:20.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1993652
Date:26.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007
[2008/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1993652
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1993652
Date:25.02.2015
[2015/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.02.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61B17/135, A61B17/80, A61M1/00, A61F2/36, A61B17/88, A61M27/00, A61M37/00
[2014/24]
Former International [2013/07]A61M29/00, A61M27/00, A61M37/00, A61M1/00, A61B17/88, A61F2/36
Former International [2008/48]A61M29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/48]
Extension statesBA26.08.2008
HR26.08.2008
RS26.08.2008
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG MIT VERMINDERTEM DRUCK MIT EINEM VERTEILER MIT PRIMÄRDURCHFLUSS UND BLOCKIERSCHUTZELEMENT[2008/48]
English:SYSTEM FOR ADMINISTERING REDUCED PRESSURE TREATMENT HAVING A MANIFOLD WITH A PRIMARY FLOW PASSAGE AND A BLOCKAGE PREVENTION MEMBER[2008/48]
French:SYSTÈME POUR APPLIQUER UN TRAITEMENT PAR PRESSION RÉDUITE COMPORTANT UN DISTRIBUTEUR AVEC UN PASSAGE D'ÉCOULEMENT PRIMAIRE ET UN ÉLÉMENT ANTIBLOCAGE[2008/48]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2008National basic fee paid 
26.08.2008Search fee paid 
26.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/48]
01.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2014Fee for grant paid
02.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.07.2015  14.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 02  14.07.2015   
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  09.07.2015  14.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 02  14.07.2015   
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstrasse 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
21.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.06.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2016
03.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1814/17
30.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1814/17
20.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1814/17
13.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2007
AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IT14.03.2017
[2018/14]
Former [2017/48]HU14.03.2007
AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/39]HU14.03.2007
AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
LU14.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL15.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004071279  (ALFRED E MANN INST BIOMED ENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0047]; figures 1a,1b,1c,5c,13f *;
 [Y]US4573965  (RUSSO RONALD D [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2005061025  (MEDELA HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6855135  (LOCKWOOD JEFFREY S [US], et al);
 [Y]US6695823  (LINA CESAR Z [US], et al)
OppositionWO2005061025
 US5370610
 US6478789
 WO2004071279