Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2011074

EP2011074 - FRAUD ANALYST SMART COOKIE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digital Envoy, Inc.
250 Scientific Drive
Norcross, Georgia 30029 / US
[2009/02]
Inventor(s)01 / GREENE, Todd
400 Sablewood Drive
Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US
02 / HELSPER, David
1815 Danforth Drive
Marietta, GA 30026 / US
 [2009/02]
Representative(s)Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/02]Neobard, William John
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07755132.311.04.2007
[2009/02]
WO2007US08760
Priority number, dateUS2006041166026.04.2006         Original published format: US 411660
[2009/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007127043
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2011074
Date:07.01.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q99/00, G06Q20/00, G06Q30/06, G06Q40/08, G06Q20/40
[2012/51]
Former International [2009/02]G06Q99/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/02]
TitleGerman:INTELLIGENTES COOKIE FÜR BETRUGSANALYSE[2009/02]
English:FRAUD ANALYST SMART COOKIE[2009/02]
French:COOKIE INTELLIGENT ANALYSEUR DE FRAUDE[2009/02]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2008National basic fee paid 
28.10.2008Search fee paid 
28.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/02]
17.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2014
25.06.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination20.08.2014Appeal received No.  T2325/14
10.11.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
06.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
05.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]US2003172036  (FEIGENBAUM IDAN [IL]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2005097320  (GOLAN LIOR [IL] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2006015727