blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2024550 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2024550



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 74
25.03.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
27.11.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
04.05.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
23.01.2009 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
21.01.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
21.01.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.12.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
22.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
10.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
10.01.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
20.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 7
29.11.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 15
06.11.2007 Abstract International Searching Authority 1