blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2024550


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.03.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
27.11.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.05.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
14.03.2014 Change - applicant published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
03.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2009 Change - designated states published on  10.06.2009  [2009/24]
08.05.2009 Change - extension states published on  10.06.2009  [2009/24]
04.05.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
06.02.2009 Amendment by applicant
21.01.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
16.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]
16.01.2009 Request for examination filed published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]
27.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication