Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024550

EP2024550 - LEVELING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.04.2015  [2015/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, IL 60025 / US
[2014/16]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAM, Robert
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
02 / WONG, Chong, B.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
P.O. Box 102605
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date07755328.712.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US09016
Priority number, dateUS20060801777P19.05.2006         Original published format: US 801777 P
US2007070182702.02.2007         Original published format: US 701827
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007136471
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024550
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/12, A47B91/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2009/24]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NIVELLIERUNGSBAUGRUPPE[2009/08]
English:LEVELING ASSEMBLY[2009/08]
French:ENSEMBLE DE NIVELLEMENT[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2008National basic fee paid 
22.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
20.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/16]
27.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2005116134  (LEE TAE-HEE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * paragraphs [0086]-[0094]; claims; figures * [A] 3,4,8-19;
 [A]US3520547  (ANTHONY TAD B) [A] 1-19 * column 1, lines 26-62; column 2, lines 26-46; claims; figures *;
 [A]US2006102815  (ERDMANN KLAUS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0022]-[0025]; claims; figures *;
 [AD]US6142431  (HERZOG RICHARD R [US]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *