Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024852

EP2024852 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TELEPRESENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2014New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAHAM, Philip, R.
638 Quince Lane
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / MACKIE, David, J.
38 N Almaden Blvd Nr.618
San Jose, CA 95110 / US
03 / DUNN, Kristin, A.
719 Travis Circle
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
04 / ERION, Kenneth
6800 Red Prairie Road
Sheridan, OR 97378 / US
 [2009/10]
Former [2009/08]01 / GRAHAM, Philip, R.
638 Quince Lane
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / MACKIE, David, J.
1936 River Road
Brookdale, CA 95007 / US
03 / DUNN, Kristin, A.
719 Travis Circle
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
04 / ERION, Kenneth
6800 Red Prairie Road
Sheridan, OR 97378 / US
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date07755553.017.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US09321
Priority number, dateUS20060794016P20.04.2006         Original published format: US 794016 P
US2006048379610.07.2006         Original published format: US 483796
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007123881
Date:01.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024852
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.08.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, H04L12/16, H04Q11/00, H04N7/14, H04N7/15
[2013/42]
Former International [2009/08]G06F15/16, H04L12/16, H04Q11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES TELEPRÄSENZSYSTEMS[2009/08]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TELEPRESENCE SYSTEM[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉPRÉSENCE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Search fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
14.03.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005213735  (RODMAN JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0087] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2005151833  (CUPAL MATTHEW D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005271062  (EZUMI YOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068] *
International search[X]US5802294  (LUDWIG LESTER F [US], et al);
 [A]US5751337  (ALLEN DAVID LEE [US], et al);
 [X]US5272526  (YONETA HAJIME [JP], et al);
 [Y]US2004004942  (NEBIKER ROBERT M [US], et al)